VA HB2320 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2320
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures; repetitive risk loss structure; flood risk information form. Requires the Real Estate Board to make available on its website a flood risk information form, the details of which are outlined in the bill. The bill also provides that an owner of residential real property located in the Commonwealth who has actual knowledge that the dwelling unit is a repetitive risk loss structure, as defined in the bill, shall disclose such fact to the purchaser on a form provided by the Real Estate Board on its website. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Real property; required disclosures for buyer to exercise due diligence, flood risk report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2320ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200111D-S1 (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200111D-S1 (93-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2320S1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200111D-S1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200111D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2320H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103911D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103911D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21100798D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2320 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
SB1389 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
SB1389 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
SB1389 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
SB1389 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)