VA HB2319 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Access to firearms; cohabitants; civil penalty. Makes it unlawful for an individual residing or cohabitating with any person who such individual knows or has reason to believe is prohibited from possessing or transporting a firearm to allow such person access to any firearm. The bill requires such individual to store such firearm in a manner that is inaccessible to such co-resident. If an individual violates any provision of the bill and the co-resident uses such firearm during the commission of a crime, such individual will be subject to a civil penalty of not more than $500, except for any crime committed against such individual. The bill further provides that an individual who lawfully possesses a firearm is not in violation of the provisions of the bill if he carries the firearm on or about his person or exercises control of the firearm. Access to firearms; cohabitants; civil penalty. Makes it unlawful for an individual residing or cohabitating with any person who such individual knows or has reason to believe is prohibited from possessing or transporting a firearm to allow such person access to any firearm. The bill requires such individual to store such firearm in a manner that is inaccessible to such co-resident. If an individual violates any provision of the bill and the co-resident uses such firearm during the commission of a crime, such individual will be subject to a civil penalty of not more than $500, except for any crime committed against such individual. The bill further provides that an individual who lawfully possesses a firearm is not in violation of the provisions of the bill if he carries the firearm on or about his person or exercises control of the firearm.
Title
Firearms; access to certain persons in a shared dwelling, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2319H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104015D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104015D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103164D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)