VA HB2317 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2317
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence; membership; duties. Increases from 15 to 19 the total number of members of the Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence (the Advisory Committee) by adding the Executive Director of the Virginia Victim Assistance Network and by increasing from six to nine the number of nonlegislative citizen members. The bill streamlines the responsibilities and duties of the Advisory Committee to (i) promotion of appropriate and effective responses, services, and prevention for sexual assault and domestic violence across the Commonwealth and (ii) promotion of strong communication, coordination, and strategy at state, regional, and local levels. Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence; membership; duties. Increases from 15 to 19 the total number of members of the Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence (the Advisory Committee) by adding the Executive Director of the Virginia Victim Assistance Network and by increasing from six to nine the number of nonlegislative citizen members. The bill streamlines the responsibilities and duties of the Advisory Committee to (i) promotion of appropriate and effective responses, services, and prevention for sexual assault and domestic violence across the Commonwealth and (ii) promotion of strong communication, coordination, and strategy at state, regional, and local levels. The bill also reorganizes the Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Professional Standards Committee (the Professional Standards Committee) to consist of 12 nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor and three nonvoting members. Under current law, the Professional Standards Committee consists of six directors of local and domestic violence programs appointed by the Advisory Committee, six directors of local sexual and domestic violence programs appointed by the Virginia sexual and domestic violence coalition, one nonvoting member appointed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services, and one nonvoting member appointed by the Virginia sexual and domestic violence coalition. The bill further outlines the duties and responsibilities of the Professional Standards Committee and of the Department of Criminal Justice Services with regard to the Professional Standards Committee.
Title
Sexual and Domestic Violence, Advisory Committee on; increases membership, duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2317ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103345D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)