VA HB2317 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence; Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence; membership; duties. Increases from 15 to 19 the total number of members of the Advisory Committee on Sexual and Domestic Violence (the Advisory Committee) by adding the Executive Director of the Virginia Victim Assistance Network and by increasing from six to nine the number of nonlegislative citizen members. The bill streamlines the responsibilities and duties of the Advisory Committee to (i) promotion of appropriate and effective responses, services, and prevention for sexual assault and domestic violence across the Commonwealth and (ii) promotion of strong communication, coordination, and strategy at state, regional, and local levels. The bill also reorganizes the Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Professional Standards Committee (the Professional Standards Committee) to consist of 12 nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor and three nonvoting members. Under current law, the Professional Standards Committee consists of six directors of local and domestic violence programs appointed by the Advisory Committee, six directors of local sexual and domestic violence programs appointed by the Virginia sexual and domestic violence coalition, one nonvoting member appointed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services, and one nonvoting member appointed by the Virginia sexual and domestic violence coalition. The bill further outlines the duties and responsibilities of the Professional Standards Committee and of the Department of Criminal Justice Services with regard to the Professional Standards Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual and Domestic Violence, Advisory Committee on; increases membership, duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-21HousePresented and ordered printed 21103345D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91116.2(n/a)See Bill Text
91116.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback