VA HB2315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Instant runoff voting. Provides for instant runoff voting in elections for statewide offices, the United States Senate, the United States House of Representatives, and the General Assembly. With instant runoff voting, voters rank the candidates for each office in order of choice, and only the candidate receiving a majority of the votes for such office is declared the winner. Ballots are initially counted as one vote for the first-choice candidate on the ballot; if no candidate receives a majority of the first-choice votes, additional rounds of ballot counting are required. In subsequent rounds of counting, each ballot is counted as one vote for that ballot's highest-ranked advancing candidate and the candidate receiving the fewest votes is eliminated, until one candidate receives a majority of the valid votes in a round.
Title
Instant runoff voting; provided in elections for statewide offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17101738D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2315 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2315+hil |