VA HB2313 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history record information; dissemination. Allows criminal history record information to be disseminated to the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services or his designee for individuals who are being evaluated by the Commissioner to determine the individual's sanity at the time of a criminal offense or capacity to stand trial for the purpose of placement, evaluation, treatment, or discharge planning.
Title
Criminal history record information; dissemination.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042) | |
2023-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 42 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2313ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2313H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105281D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105281D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23102877D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1132 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)
SB1132 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)
SB1132 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)