VA HB2311 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education improvement scholarships tax credit; reporting requirement. Makes the required report of contributions qualifying for the credit and scholarships awarded from such contributions a calendar year report. The report currently is based on each scholarship foundation's fiscal year. This change will enable the Department of Education to determine whether a scholarship foundation has complied with the statutory requirement to disburse at least 90 percent of its tax-credit-derived funds received during each 12-month period ending on June 30 by the following June 30 for educational scholarships.
Title
Education improvement scholarships tax credit; reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15101404D |