VA HB2310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence; emergency. Provides that any applicant for a concealed handgun permit who completed an online course to demonstrate competence with a handgun and contacted the circuit court clerk's office prior to January 1, 2021, but was prohibited from appearing in person at a circuit court clerk's office because of COVID-19 restrictions is eligible to apply for such permit through April 30, 2021. The bill contains an emergency clause. Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence; emergency. Provides that any applicant for a concealed handgun permit who completed an online course to demonstrate competence with a handgun and contacted the circuit court clerk's office prior to January 1, 2021, but was prohibited from appearing in person at a circuit court clerk's office because of COVID-19 restrictions is eligible to apply for such permit through April 30, 2021. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (81-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2310H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104074D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104074D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 21102421D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2310 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)