VA HB2309 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act; definitions. Expands the definition of "motor vehicle" in the Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act to include a vehicle with a gross vehicle weight under 10,000 pounds that is bought or used primarily for business purposes by a person or certain legal business entities to which not more than five motor vehicles are registered. The bill also adds electronic mail communications to the definition of "notify" or "notification" in the Act.
Title
Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act; expands definition of motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23102795D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 207.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |