VA HB2307 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2307

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Consumer Data Protection Act. Establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data in the Commonwealth. The bill applies to all persons that conduct business in the Commonwealth and either (i) control or process personal data of at least 100,000 consumers or (ii) derive over 50 percent of gross revenue from the sale of personal data and control or process personal data of at least 25,000 consumers. The bill outlines responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors. The bill does not apply to state or local governmental entities and contains exceptions for certain types of data and information governed by federal law. The bill grants consumer rights to access, correct, delete, and obtain a copy of personal data and to opt out of the processing of personal data for purposes of targeted advertising, the sale of personal data, or profiling of the consumer. The bill provides that the Attorney General has exclusive authority to enforce violations of the law, and the Consumer Privacy Fund is created to support this effort. The bill directs the Joint Commission on Technology and Science to establish a work group to review the provisions of this act and issues related to its implementation, and to report on its findings by November 1, 2021. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Data Protection Act; personal data rights of consumer, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (85-Y 8-N) (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
2021-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective - 1/1/23)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2307ER)
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Adoption (85-Y 8-N)
2021-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200206D-S1 (85-Y 8-N)
2021-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N)
2021-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2307S1
2021-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200206D-S1
2021-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-19SenateRead third time
2021-02-18SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200206D-S1
2021-02-16SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 9-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2307H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103642D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103642D-H1
2021-01-25HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-01-20HousePresented and ordered printed 21103250D

Same As/Similar To

HB2307 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
SB1392 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
SB1392 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591581(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2307
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2307+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2307H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2307S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2307ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0035+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200206D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2307F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2307FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2307FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2307FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H21C0011+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1252+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0156+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0040+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0071+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2307+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0201HB2307+HB2307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1790+HB2307

Bill Comments

feedback