VA HB2307 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Consumer Data Protection Act. Establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data in the Commonwealth. The bill applies to all persons that conduct business in the Commonwealth and either (i) control or process personal data of at least 100,000 consumers or (ii) derive over 50 percent of gross revenue from the sale of personal data and control or process personal data of at least 25,000 consumers. The bill outlines responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors. The bill does not apply to state or local governmental entities and contains exceptions for certain types of data and information governed by federal law. The bill grants consumer rights to access, correct, delete, and obtain a copy of personal data and to opt out of the processing of personal data for the purposes of targeted advertising. The bill provides that the Attorney General has exclusive authority to enforce violations of the law, and the Consumer Privacy Fund is created to support this effort. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Data Protection Act; establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 9-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2307H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103642D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103642D-H1
2021-01-25HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-01-20HousePresented and ordered printed 21103250D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591581(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback