VA HB2306 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Immunizations; authority of the Commissioner of Health; religious exception. Exempts a person, including a parent or guardian on behalf of a child, who objects to administration of a vaccine on religious grounds from mandatory immunization requirements issued by the Commissioner of Health during an epidemic. Currently, exemption from mandatory immunization requirements during an epidemic is available only to those persons to whose health the administration of the vaccine would be detrimental, as certified in writing by a licensed physician. Immunizations; authority of the Commissioner of Health; religious exception. Exempts a person, including a parent or guardian on behalf of a child, who objects to administration of a vaccine on religious grounds from mandatory immunization requirements issued by the Commissioner of Health during an epidemic. Currently, exemption from mandatory immunization requirements during an epidemic is available only to those persons to whose health the administration of the vaccine would be detrimental, as certified in writing by a licensed physician.
Title
Immunizations; authority of the Commissioner of Health, religious tenets or practices, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 23103428D-E |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2306E |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103428D |