VA HB2305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Health and Human Resources; certain waivers under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. Prohibits the Secretary of Health and Human Resources from applying for, accepting, or renewing any statewide or local waivers of the eligibility requirements for participation in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
SHHR; certain waivers under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17100914D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2305 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2305+hil |