VA HB2305 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Solar panels in community associations. Clarifies that a community association may establish reasonable restrictions concerning the size, place, and manner of placement of solar energy collection devices on property designated and intended for individual ownership and use. The bill also requires the resale certificate required under the Virginia Condominium Act and the disclosure packet under the Virginia Property Owners' Association Act to contain a statement setting forth any restriction, limitation, or prohibition on the right of an owner to install or use solar energy collection devices on his property. In addition, the bill adds to the seller's representation to a prospective purchaser of residential property under the Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act that the seller makes no representations with respect to right to install or use solar energy collection devices on the property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community associations; restrictions on solar panels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
2013-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-22SenateSigned by President
2013-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2305ER)
2013-02-21HouseEnrolled
2013-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
2013-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 13105065D-S1 (96-Y 2-N)
2013-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2305S1
2013-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 13105065D-S1
2013-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2013-02-14SenateRead third time
2013-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 13105065D-S1
2013-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2013-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2013-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2013-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2013-01-28HouseRead first time
2013-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2013-01-22HouseAssigned GL sub: #1 Housing
2013-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2013-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 13103065D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2305
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2305+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2305S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2305ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0357+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H1101V0027+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H11V0079+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0399+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S12V0140+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0491HB2305+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0530HB2305+HB2305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1018+HB2305

Bill Comments

feedback