VA HB2304 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Motorcycle rider safety training courses. Changes one of the three available types of motorcycle training courses from a sidecar and three-wheeled motorcycle course to a three-wheeled motorcycle course and changes the helmet requirement for motorcycle training courses from a three-quarter shell motorcycle helmet to any lawful motorcycle helmet. The bill removes the specific motorcycle training course requirements for (i) the student-to-instructor ratio, (ii) the students per range at any one time, and (iii) the features of motorcycles used in training and requires such aspects of the motorcycle training course to comply with the recommendations of the Motorcycle Safety Foundation, unless otherwise provided by the Department of Motor Vehicles. Motorcycle rider safety training courses. Changes one of the three available types of motorcycle training courses from a sidecar and three-wheeled motorcycle course to a three-wheeled motorcycle course and changes the helmet requirement for motorcycle training courses from a three-quarter shell motorcycle helmet to any lawful motorcycle helmet. The bill removes the specific motorcycle training course requirements for (i) the student-to-instructor ratio, (ii) the students per range at any one time, and (iii) the features of motorcycles used in training and requires such aspects of the motorcycle training course to comply with the recommendations of the Motorcycle Safety Foundation, unless otherwise provided by the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycles; rider safety training courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
2023-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2304ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-26HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
2023-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2023-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 23104612D-EH1
2023-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2304EH1
2023-01-25HouseAmendments by Delegate Bloxom agreed to
2023-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 23104612D-H1
2023-01-25HouseRead second time
2023-01-24HousePassed by for the day
2023-01-23HouseRead first time
2023-01-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 23104612D-H1
2023-01-19HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 23103662D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621190(n/a)See Bill Text
4621190.1(n/a)See Bill Text
4621190.2(n/a)See Bill Text
4621190.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2304
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2304+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2304H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2304EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2304ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0361+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104612D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/23104612D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105430A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB2304AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2304FEH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2304FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1901V0009+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0024+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0036+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1104+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S11V0083+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2304+HB2304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB2304+HB2304

Bill Comments

feedback