VA HB2304 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2304
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provision of broadband capacity by Phase I or Phase II electric utilities. Makes permanent the pilot program under which a Phase I or Phase II electric utility is permitted to petition the State Corporation Commission to provide broadband capacity to unserved areas of the Commonwealth. The bill expands the program to allow for the participation of municipalities and government-owned broadband authorities. The bill provides that investor-owned electric utilities may recover costs of and revenue generated from providing broadband capacity that serves as an electric grid transformation project in areas unserved by broadband, as defined in the bill. The bill also consolidates the State Corporation Commission petition approval process into one hearing.
Title
Phase I or Phase II electric utilities; provision of broadband capacity.
Sponsors
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 369 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2304ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21104404D-S1(99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2304S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104404D-S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104404D-S1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102868D-E |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2304E |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102868D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2304 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
SB1413 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
SB1413 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
SB1413 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
SB1413 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)