VA HB2304 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; renter's insurance obtained by landlord on behalf of tenants; notice of waiver of subrogation provisions. Requires a landlord that has obtained renter's insurance coverage on behalf of his tenants to include, as part of the summary of the insurance policy or certificate evidencing the coverage as currently required by law, a statement regarding whether the insurance policy contains a waiver of subrogation provision. The bill provides that any failure of the landlord to provide such summary or certificate, or to make available a copy of the insurance policy, shall not affect the validity of the rental agreement.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord may obtain insurance for tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2304ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2304H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106151D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106151D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100281D |