VA HB2304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; requirements related to long-term care. Provides that the Department of Medical Assistance Services shall require all individuals who administer preadmission screenings for long-term care services to receive training on and be certified in the use of the Uniform Assessment Instrument; requires the Department to develop a program for the training and certification of preadmission screeners, develop guidelines for a standardized preadmission screening process, and strengthen oversight of the preadmission screening process to ensure that problems are identified and addressed promptly. The bill requires the Department to make a number of changes to contracts for long-term care services provided by managed care organizations; directs the Department to impose additional requirements related to submission of data and information by managed care organizations; and requires the Department to implement a number of spending and utilization control measures in conjunction with managed care organizations.
Title
Long-term care; requirements of Department of Medical Assistance Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2304ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Hanger, Howell, Newman |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Orrock, O'Bannon, Rasoul |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105597D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2304S1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105597D-S1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105597D-S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2304H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 17105180D-H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee substitute rejected 17104925D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105180D-H2 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104925D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103363D |
Subjects
Health
Long-Term Care
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Senior Citizens
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Long-Term Care
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Senior Citizens
Study Commissions Committees and Reports