VA HB2303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification of registration. Provides that a registered sex offender who enters an emergency shelter designated by the Commonwealth or any political subdivision thereof and operated in response to a declared state or local emergency shall, as soon as practicable after entry, notify a member of the shelter's staff who is responsible for providing security of such person's status as a registered sex offender. The bill provides that any person who fails to notify the shelter's staff of his status as a registered sex offender is guilty of a Class 3 misdemeanor. This bill provides that no person shall be denied entry solely on the basis of his status as a sex offender unless such entry is otherwise prohibited by law, but emergency shelter staff may deny entry of a person on such registry who has been convicted of a sexually violent offense for a period of time necessary to ensure the safety of other individuals admitted to the emergency shelter. This bill is identical to SB 1047.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 56-N) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 92 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 56-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (41-Y 56-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2303ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2019-02-23SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107718D-H1
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Cosgrove, Petersen, Obenshain
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Leftwich, Bell, Robert B., Herring
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106797D-S1 (5-Y 92-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2303S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106797D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106797D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 3-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100280D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91906.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2303
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2303+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2303S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2303H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2303ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0804V0016+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0128+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2475+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0277+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2303+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2303+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2909+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0788HB2303+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3333+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1117HB2303+HB2303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3387+HB2303

Bill Comments

feedback