VA HB2303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexually violent predators; notice of hearings; conditional release plan. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, in preparing a conditional release plan for a sexually violent predator, to notify the attorney for the Commonwealth, the chief law-enforcement officer, and the local governing body for the locality that is the proposed location of the predator's residence upon his conditional release. The bill also provides that such attorney for the Commonwealth shall receive a copy of any petition (i) for the conditional release of a predator, (ii) to take a conditionally released predator into emergency custody, (iii) for the release of a predator taken into emergency custody, or (iv) to modify or remove conditions on a predator's release.
Title
Sexually violent predators; notice of hearings, conditional release plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2303ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2303H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104392D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104392D-H1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103786D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |