VA HB2302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Veterans Services; membership; duties. Removes requirements regarding specific areas of expertise for members appointed to the Board of Veterans Services (the Board) by the Governor. The bill also (i) extends the number of consecutive terms for legislative members from four to six two-year terms for members of the House of Delegates and from two to three four-year terms for members of the Senate; (ii) removes the requirement that the Board be organized into at least three standing committees; and (iii) makes other changes to the administration of the Board and the eligibility for reappointment of nonlegislative citizen members of the Board. This bill is identical to SB 1182.
Title
Veterans Services, Board of; membership, duties.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Christopher Stolle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2302ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103606D |