VA HB2300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; frequency of inspections. Provides that in cases in which inspections of emergency medical services agencies and vehicles, hospitals, hospices, home care organizations, restaurants, summer camps, campgrounds, and hotels are required, no licensee shall receive additional inspections until every other licensee in that category has been inspected, unless the additional inspection is (i) necessary to follow up on a preoperational inspection or one or more violations, (ii) required by a uniformly applied risk-based schedule established by the Department of Health, (iii) necessary to investigate a complaint, or (iv) otherwise deemed necessary to protect the public health and safety.
Title
Health, Department of; frequency of inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2300ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2300H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104683D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104683D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17100856D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 111.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 125.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
35 | 1 | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |