VA HB23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Red Tape Reduction Commission; review of regulatory Red Tape Reduction Commission; review of regulatory requirements; report. Creates the Red Tape Reduction Commission (the Commission) to develop and maintain a state regulatory baseline of all current state regulatory requirements, with the initial baseline to be completed by January 1, 2020. The bill defines a regulatory requirement as any action required to be taken or information required to be provided in accordance with a statute or regulation in order to access government services or operate and conduct business and excludes requirements that are necessary to conform to changes in Virginia statutory law or the appropriation act where no agency discretion is involved or to meet requirements of federal law or regulations. The bill also provides that after the regulatory baseline has been established, any subsequent regulatory requirement proposed by an agency that is not included in the initial state regulatory baseline is considered a new regulatory requirement and requires the approval of the Commission before it may be enacted. The bill prohibits the Commission from approving a new regulation unless it replaces or repeals at least two existing regulations, until the total baseline has been reduced by 35 percent. Thereafter, approvals and corresponding replacement or repeal by the Commission shall be on a one-for-one basis. In addition, the bill provides for the Commission to review current state regulatory requirements and provide recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on measures to reduce the baseline regulatory requirements. The bill requires the Commission to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly by November 1, 2018, on (i) the organizational structure of the Commission, (ii) duties of staff, and (iii) guidelines for determining what constitutes a
Title
Red Tape Reduction Commission; created, review of regulatory requirements, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-11-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100764D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2537 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |