VA HB2299 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health services plans; effects of actions of other states. Requires the State Corporation Commission (SCC) to conduct a proceeding to review and evaluate the effect of a law or other regulatory action of another state that requires a health services plan operating in the Commonwealth to distribute or reduce its surplus on grounds that it is excessive. Currently the SCC may, but is not required to, conduct such a proceeding or examination only when another state enacts a law providing a program or benefits for the residents of the other state. The measure authorizes the SCC, if it finds that the other state's action is harmful to the interests of residents of the Commonwealth, to (i) prohibit the health services plan from distributing or reducing its surplus for the benefit of residents of another state or (ii) take any other action the SCC finds necessary to protect the interests of the residents of the Commonwealth. The measure also prohibits a health services plan from distributing or reducing its surplus pursuant to a law or regulatory action that is the subject of such a proceeding by the SCC except with the approval of the SCC. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Health services plans; effects of actions of other states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 3/23/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2299ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2299H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104777D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104777D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 15103806D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1405 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)