VA HB2299 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax and sales and use tax. Removes the remaining portion of the state sales and use tax (one and one-half percent) from food for human consumption (effective July 1, 2012) and restructures the individual income tax rate brackets for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2012. The changes in the individual income tax brackets are as follows: In Excess Of But No More Than Tax Rate $0 $3,000 2.0% (same as current law) $3,000 $5,000 3.0% (same as current law) $5,000 $20,000 5.0% (increase in top income amt) $20,000 $300,000 5.75% (new income amounts) $300,000 6.75% (new top rate)
Title
Income and sales & use taxes; removes remaining portion of tax from food for human consumption, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100717D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 611.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2299 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2299+hil |