VA HB2298 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2298

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Muzzleloading rifle and shotgun; definitions. Removes the requirement that the propellant be loaded along with the projectile or projectiles in the definitions of muzzleloading rifle and muzzleloading shotgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muzzleloading rifle and shotgun; clarifies definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 22-N) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2298ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (74-Y 22-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (74-Y 22-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2021-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 21102689D

Same As/Similar To

HB2298 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2298
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2298+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2298ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0432+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2298F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2298FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0054+HB2298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1506+HB2298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0177+HB2298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0065+HB2298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2298+HB2298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB2298+HB2298

Bill Comments 750

feedback