VA HB2298 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Muzzleloading rifle and shotgun; definitions. Removes the requirement that the propellant be loaded along with the projectile or projectiles in the definitions of muzzleloading rifle and muzzleloading shotgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muzzleloading rifle and shotgun; clarifies definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 22-N) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (74-Y 22-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (74-Y 22-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2021-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 21102689D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback