VA HB2298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Riparian planting grounds lease; eligibility. Reduces from 205 feet to 105 feet the minimum low-water shore front that makes the landowner eligible to apply for riparian planting grounds assignment by the Commissioner of the Marine Resources Commission.
Title
Riparian planting grounds lease; eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105105D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17102804D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Riparian Rights
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Riparian Rights
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors