VA HB2298 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Billboards. Establishes conditions under which certain billboard signs may be relocated if land on which the billboard sign is located is acquired by eminent domain in connection with a highway project.
Title
Billboards; establishes conditions under which certain signs may be adjusted or relocated, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2298ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 36-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2298H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104369D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104369D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103953D |
Same As/Similar To
SB820 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)