VA HB2297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Free public elementary and secondary education; eligibility criteria. Requires every person of school age to be deemed to reside in a school division for the purpose of eligibility for free public elementary and secondary education in such school division when all or any portion of the building in which such person resides with certain other individuals or as an emancipated minor is taxable by the locality in which the school division is located. The bill provides that each student who resides on property that is located in more than one school division and who registers for enrollment at a public school in one such school division prior to July 1, 2019, and any sibling of any such student, is deemed to reside in the enrolled school division and is eligible to attend public school in such school division for free.
Title
Free public elementary and secondary education; eligibility criteria.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2297ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106590D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2297S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106590D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106590D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103220D |