VA HB2296 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Rights of persons with disabilities; procedures for certain actions; website accessibility. Provides that when a complaint is filed alleging that the website of a bank, trust company, savings institution, or credit union does not comply with applicable law regarding its accessibility by the vision impaired or hearing impaired, the action shall be commenced no sooner than 120 days after the claimant files a written statement of the nature of the claim. The bill further provides that a website of a bank, trust company, savings institution, or credit union is in compliance with Virginia's laws prohibiting discrimination against people with disabilities if it meets the Web Content Accessibility Guidelines 2.0 Level AA as developed by the Web Accessibility Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of persons w/disabilities; procedure for certain actions, website accessibility of bank, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 58-N) (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 58-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (39-Y 58-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseGovernor's substitute printed 19107784D-H3
2019-03-25HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2296ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2019-02-23SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 43-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 43-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107715D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Barker, Favola, Chafin
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Leftwich, Miyares, Mullin
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106926D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2296S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106926D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106926D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-02-08SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 36-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2296H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106246D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106246D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103886D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51546.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2296
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2296H3+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0066+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0127+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2474+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0075+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0299+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0766HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3063+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0856HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3332+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1102HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1104HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1105HB2296+HB2296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3386+HB2296

Bill Comments

feedback