VA HB2296 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tolling authority. Requires approval by the General Assembly before the imposition or collection of tolls or user fees on any interstate, primary, or secondary highway, on any project undertaken pursuant to the PPTA, or by the HRTAC, NVTA, or RMTA.
Title
Tolling authority; approval by General Assembly before collecting or imposing tolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103519D |