VA HB2296 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Scholars Program and Investment Fund; established. Provides for the establishment of the Commonwealth Scholars Program and Investment Fund whereby public or private organizations and individuals may make monetary contributions to provide scholarships for eligible students in order to expand access to higher education. Scholarship funds may be paid to any accredited, degree-granting public or private nonprofit institution of higher education in Virginia. Eligibility for the scholarships is limited to domiciled residents of Virginia as defined by §23-7.4 and who are admitted and enrolled as full-time students in a public or nonprofit private institution of higher education, and any other criteria established by the Council. Each scholarship recipient will be required to sign a promissory note agreeing to annually pay back into the Fund a percentage of his annual income, not to exceed five percent, beginning five years after the end of the scholarship funded program, and for a period not to exceed 25 years.
Title
Commonwealth Scholars Program and Investment Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101586D |