VA HB2295 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-20 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-20 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Intergovernmental Affairs; duties of the Assistant to the Governor. Provides for the Assistant to the Governor for Intergovernmental Affairs to convene at least annually a meeting of the Virginia Congressional Delegation and a delegation representing the General Assembly.
Title
Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of; duties of Assistant to Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103849D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2295E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103849D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports