VA HB2294 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2294
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Odometer disclosure exemption. Provides that the exemption from disclosing a vehicle's odometer reading applies only to vehicles exempt from recording an odometer in another state that were manufactured (i) in or before the 2010 model year and transferred at least 10 years after January 1 of the vehicle's model year or (ii) in or after the 2011 model year and transferred at least 20 years after January 1 of the vehicle's model year. Current law exempts disclosure for vehicles exempt from disclosure in another state that were manufactured for a model year at least 10 years earlier than the vehicle transfer. This bill complies with federal regulations regarding odometer disclosure exemptions.
Title
Vehicle's odometer; disclosure exemption.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102099D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)