VA HB2294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance credits for retired school division employees. Requires school divisions to provide a health insurance credit of $4 per year of service to all retired members of local school divisions with at least 15 years of total creditable service. Currently, the $4 per year health insurance credit is provided only to teachers, and non-teacher school division employees are eligible for a credit of $1.50 per year of service, capped at $45 per month, if the locality has elected such coverage. An enactment clause provides that this measure does apply to any local school division employee who retired on disability prior to July 1, 2017, if this measure would reduce the monthly credit currently payable to such former member. Eligible employees who retired prior to July 1, 2017, but who did not receive a health insurance credit prior to that date will only receive the $4 per year health insurance credit prospectively.
Title
Health insurance; credits for retired school division employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103172D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2294 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2294+hil |