VA HB2294 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carnal knowledge of an inmate; expansion to include defendants on bond. Provides that an accused is guilty of carnal knowledge of a pretrial defendant or posttrial offender if he (i) is an owner or employee of the bail bond company that posted the pretrial defendant's or posttrial offender's bond, (ii) has the authority to revoke the pretrial defendant's or posttrial offender's bond, and (iii) carnally knows, without use of force, threat, or intimidation, a pretrial defendant or posttrial offender. Such offense is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Inmates; carnal knowledge, expansion to include defendants on bond, penalty is Class 1 misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2294ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2294H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104905D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104905D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103930D |