VA HB2294 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; Social Security offset. Eliminates the requirement that unemployment compensation benefits be reduced by 50 percent of the amount of the claimant's Social Security Act or Railroad Retirement Act retirement benefits in years when the solvency level of the unemployment trust fund is less than 50 percent. Currently, such a reduction in unemployment benefits is not required in years when the solvency level of the unemployment trust fund exceeds 50 percent.
Title
Unemployment compensation; eliminates requirement that certain benefits be reduced by 50 percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102299D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2294 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2294+hil |