VA HB2292 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial training; law related to rights of persons Judicial training; law related to rights of persons of legitimate interest in custody and visitation proceedings. Directs the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia to require that all juvenile and domestic relations district court judges receive training, at least once during each six-year judicial term, on the rights of persons of legitimate interest in child custody and visitation proceedings.
Title
Judicial training; law related to rights of persons of legitimate interest in custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103266D |
Subjects
Child Custody
Domestic Relations
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Supreme Court of Virginia
Uncodified Legislation
Domestic Relations
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Supreme Court of Virginia
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2292 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2292+hil |