VA HB2290 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit for hiring military veterans. Establishes beginning January 1, 2013, but before January 1, 2018, an individual and corporate income tax credit for taxpayers hiring returning or disabled military veterans into new full-time jobs paying an annual salary of at least $30,000. Returning military veterans are persons who served on active duty on or after September 1, 2001, but not including any person who first served on active duty on or after January 1, 2015. Disabled military veterans are persons who are rated by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs as having at least a 50 percent service-connected disability and who were unemployed for at least six months in the calendar year immediately preceding the date on which they were hired into the new job. The tax credit would equal $500 for each returning or disabled military veteran hired. No credit would be allowed for any year in which the number of full-time employees of the taxpayer is less than the average annual number of full-time employees of the taxpayer in the immediately preceding three years. Any unused tax credit could be carried forward for five years.
Title
Income tax, state and corporate; tax credit for hiring certain veterans with salary of $30,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103723D |