VA HB229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; per student enrollment-based funding; noncredit workforce training programs. Requires the per student enrollment-based funding provided to public institutions of higher education to include funding for each Virginia student enrolled in a noncredit workforce training program. Under current law, per student enrollment-based funding follows each Virginia undergraduate student.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; per student enrollment-based funding, noncredit workforce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2019-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101766D |
Same As/Similar To
HB229 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB229 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB229+hil |