VA HB2289 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Award of life insurance upon divorce or dissolution of marriage. Provides that where an order for spousal support or separate maintenance has been entered by the court, the court may order a party to maintain an existing life insurance policy, designate the other party as beneficiary, allocate the premium cost of life insurance between the parties, and order the insured party to facilitate the provision of certain information from the insurer to the beneficiary. The bill sets out factors to be considered by the court when making such an award and provides that any obligation or requirement under any such court order ceases upon the termination of the party's obligation to pay spousal support or separate maintenance. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Divorce or dissolution of marriage; award of life insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2289ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 4-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2289ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 17105354D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2289S1
2017-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105354D-S1
2017-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105354D-S1
2017-02-15SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 17101622D-E
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2289E
2017-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 17101622D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2289
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2289+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2289E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2289S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2289ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2289ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0797+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0802V0069+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0071+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1839+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0307+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB2289+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0725HB2289+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2619+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2893+HB2289
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1175HB2289+HB2289

Bill Comments 750

feedback