VA HB2289 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Auxiliary lights on public utility vehicles. Provides that any electrical service utility vehicle owned and operated by a public utility and having a gross vehicle weight rating greater than 15,000 pounds may be equipped with clear auxiliary lights mounted on the lower portion of the vehicle and aimed downward for the exclusive use of ground lighting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auxiliary lights on public utility vehicles; certain vehicles may be equipped with clear lights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
2015-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 341 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15
2015-02-27SenateSigned by President
2015-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2289ER)
2015-02-27HouseEnrolled
2015-02-23SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2015-02-23SenateRead third time
2015-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-18SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2015-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2015-02-06HouseRead first time
2015-02-05HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2015-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2015-01-30HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2015-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2015-01-21HousePresented and ordered printed 15103761D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621028.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback