VA HB2289 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance credits for retired school division employees. Expands the recipients of the health insurance credits currently going to retired teachers to all retired employees of local school divisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; credits for retired school division employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2013-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2013-01-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
2013-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 13103639D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5111400(n/a)See Bill Text
5111401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback