VA HB2286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Court appearance of a person not free on bail. Makes various changes to provisions regarding bail hearings, including (i) the appointment of counsel for the accused, (ii) the information provided to counsel for the accused, (iii) a requirement that counsel for the accused be provided with adequate time to confer with the accused prior to any bail hearing, and (iv) the compensation of counsel for the accused. Effective in due course, the bill provides that the chief judge in each circuit shall create a plan to be completed by October 1, 2021, that establishes the means by which the jurisdiction will meet these requirements. The remainder of the bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Court appearance of a person not free on bail; changes to provisions regarding bail hearings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101768D |