VA HB2285 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of easement; Shenandoah River State Park. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to grant and convey an easement at Shenandoah River State Park (Park) to Front Royal Parcel 1, LLC (Grantee) for the purpose of conveying a right-of-way on the location of the existing State Route 737 (Thunderbird Road) to the Grantee to provide access to the lands of the Grantee bisected by the Park.
Title
Shenandoah River State Park; conveyance of easement.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 68 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2285ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101286D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1059 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)