VA HB2284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2284
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstatement of certain driving privileges. Directs the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to reinstate driving privileges, and to waive fees related to the reinstatement, for individuals whose privileges were suspended prior to July 1, 2019, for failure to pay court fines and costs in other jurisdictions.
Title
Driving privileges, certain; Commissioner of DMV to reinstate privileges and waive fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102066D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2284 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)