VA HB2284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Debt management plans. Exempts banks, savings institutions, and credit unions from Chapter 20 of Title 6.2, which provides for the Bureau of Financial Institution's regulation of agencies that provide debt management plans.
Title
Debt management plans, providers of; exempts entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 325 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2284ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101443D |