VA HB2284 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; subpoena powers of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; enforcement; penalty. Provides that any person who fails or refuses to obey any subpoena issued by the Department is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Charitable gaming; subpoena powers of Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103810D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2284 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2284+hil |