VA HB2279 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Forensic Science; purchase of forensic laboratory services. Permits the Department of Forensic Science (the Department) to purchase forensic laboratory services from laboratories located in the Commonwealth that are operated by an institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth or a corporate entity that is wholly owned by an institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth, where such institution meets certain requirements. The bill provides that no contract or agreement may be made with any other laboratory unless the Department requests, and the Department of General Services grants, an exemption in a case where such laboratory does not meet the reasonable requirements of the Department, cannot provide the forensic laboratory services required by the Department, or the Department can purchase forensic laboratory services from another source at a price that is at least 10 percent less or from a laboratory that has received a ranking that is at least 10 percent higher than the ranking of any laboratory of such institution of higher education. The bill also provides that any laboratory that has entered into a contract with the Department for the provision of forensic laboratory services shall be deemed authorized by the Department to conduct certain analyses and examinations of certain trial evidence. This bill is identical to SB 1274.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forensic Science, Department of; purchase of forensic laboratory services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2279ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2279H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105024D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105024D-H1
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100061D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
911101.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2279
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2279+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2279H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2279ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0478+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0002+HB2279
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0019+HB2279
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2320+HB2279
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0335+HB2279
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2279+HB2279
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2279+HB2279

Bill Comments

feedback